Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1908152

EP1908152 - LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MBDA UK LIMITED
Six Hills Way Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2DA / GB
[2008/15]
Inventor(s)01 / JENNINGS, Martyn Robert
MBDA UK Limited, Po Box 5
Filton Bristol BS23 7QW / GB
02 / MILLER, Lee Douglas
MBDA UK Limited, Po Box 5
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
 [2008/15]
Representative(s)Lewis, Debra Louise , et al
BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]Lewis, Debra Louise , et al
BAE Systems plc Group IPDepartment Lancaster House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Center
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
Application number, filing date06765373.327.07.2006
[2008/15]
WO2006GB50225
Priority number, dateGB2005001543127.07.2005         Original published format: GB 0515431
[2008/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007012902
Date:01.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1908152
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007
[2008/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1908152
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/094, H01S3/06, H01S3/11, H01S3/16, H01S3/07
[2008/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LASER[2008/15]
English:LASER[2008/15]
French:LASER[2008/15]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2008National basic fee paid 
30.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/15]
14.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2010Fee for grant paid
10.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
TR21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
BG21.07.2010
GR22.07.2010
IE27.07.2010
LU27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
HU22.10.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/47]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
BG21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
TR21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IE27.07.2010
LU27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
HU22.10.2010
Former [2012/44]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
BG21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IE27.07.2010
LU27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
HU22.10.2010
Former [2012/42]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
BG21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IE27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
HU22.10.2010
Former [2012/41]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
BG21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IE27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/36]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IE27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/20]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/18]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/09]AT21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/05]AT21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
LV21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
CY26.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
IS21.08.2010
Former [2010/45]NL21.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US6038240
 [AD]GB2384126
 [A]  GOLLA D ET AL: "62-W CW TEM00 ND:YAG LASER SIDE-PUMPED BY FIBER-COUPLED DIODE LASERS" OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 21, no. 3, 1 February 1996 (1996-02-01), pages 210-212, XP000629027 ISSN: 0146-9592
by applicant GB2384126