Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025193

EP2025193 - ACOUSTIC CORRECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pellisari, Francesco
Via S. Francesco a Ripa 136
00153 Roma (RM) / IT
[2013/29]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Pellisari, Francesco
Via S. Francesco a Ripa 136
00153 Roma (RM) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Capasso, Olga , et al
De Simone & Partners SpA
Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20
00198 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2012/49]Capasso, Olga , et al
De Simone & Partners S.p.A. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20
00198 Roma / IT
Former [2010/03]Romano, Giuseppe , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti Piazza di Pietra 38-39
00186 Roma / IT
Former [2009/08]Papa, Elisabetta , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 38-39
00186 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date06766294.017.05.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006IT00369
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132492
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025193
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025193
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/02, F21V33/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AKUSTIKKORREKTURVORRICHTUNG[2009/08]
English:ACOUSTIC CORRECTION DEVICE[2009/08]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION ACOUSTIQUE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2008National basic fee paid 
15.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
18.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2013Fee for grant paid
07.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2012
Opposition(s)22.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.05.2006
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU17.05.2006
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2016/25]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2015/09]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT17.07.2013
PT18.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4440583
 [X]DE29819574U
 [X]EP1389030
 [X]WO8805685
 [X]US5163747
 [Y]JPH0974595
Examination US5778081
  US4899387