EP2026917 - RETAINED MANDREL ROLLING MILL FOR SEAMLESS TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS INNSE S.p.A Via Milano 4 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states SMS Demag INNSE S.p.A. Via Milano, 4 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARIN Paolo Via Bucella, 55 27029 VIGEVANO (Pavia) / IT | 02 /
RINALDI Patrizio Viale Morandi, 29 20010 BAREGGIO (Milano) / IT | 03 /
PALMA Vincenzo Viale Casiraghi, 325 20099 SESTO SAN GIOVANNI (Milano) / IT | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
MARIN Paolo Via Bucella, 55 27029 VIGEVANO (Pavia) / IT | ||
02 /
RINALDI Patrizio Viale Morandi, 29 20010 BAREGGIO (Milano) / IT | |||
03 /
PALMA Vincenzo Viale casiraghi, 325 20099 SESTO SAN GIOVANNI (Milano) / IT | |||
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
MARIN Paolo Via Bucella, 55 27029 VIGEVANO (Pavia) / IT | ||
02 /
RINALDI Patrizio Viale Morandi, 29 20010 BAREGGIO (Milano) / IT | |||
03 /
PALMA Vincenzo Viale casiraghi, 325 20099 SESTO SAN GIOVANNI (Milano) / IT | |||
04 /
BANDINI Stefano Via Mosè Bianchi, 30 20063 CERNUSCO S. NAVIGLIO (Milano) / IT | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06766322.9 | 12.06.2006 | [2009/09] | WO2006IT00438 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144905 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | IT | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026917 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026917 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B21B17/04 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B21B17/04 (EP,US);
B21B27/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | 09.12.2008 | BA | 09.12.2008 | HR | 09.12.2008 | MK | 09.12.2008 | RS | 09.12.2008 | Title | German: | WERK ZUM WALZEN MIT FESTGEHALTENEM DORN FÜR NAHTLOSE ROHRE | [2009/09] | English: | RETAINED MANDREL ROLLING MILL FOR SEAMLESS TUBES | [2009/09] | French: | LAMINOIR À MANDRIN RETENU POUR TUBES SANS SOUDURES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | Translation filed | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 08.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | BE | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | PL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
TR | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
LT | 25.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3703756 (KOCKS TECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0719600 (INNOCENTI ENG SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * figures 2-5 * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]WO9719767 (INNOCENTI ENG SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]WO9947284 (DEMAG ITALIMPIANTI SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 2,4,5 *[Y] 4-6 |