Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023695

EP2023695 - ION GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.07.2015  [2015/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koganei Corporation
8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0032 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / IGARASHI, Tsukasa
c/o KOGANEI CORPORATION
8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0032 / JP
 [2014/33]
Former [2009/07]01 / IGARASHI, Tsukasa
c/o KOGANEI CORPORATION 8-16, Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0032 / JP
Representative(s)Plaçais, Jean Yves , et al
Cabinet Netter
36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Bezault, Jean
Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2009/07]Bezault, Jean
Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06767490.328.06.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006JP312873
Priority number, dateJP2006015807207.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006158072
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007141885
Date:13.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023695
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023695
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:H05F3/06, H01T23/00
[2011/51]
Former International [2009/07]H05F3/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/32]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IONENGENERATOR[2009/07]
English:ION GENERATOR[2009/07]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR D'IONS[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2008Translation filed 
25.11.2008National basic fee paid 
25.11.2008Search fee paid 
25.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
08.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2014Fee for grant paid
01.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2014
Opposition(s)15.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
19.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed