Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1911020

EP1911020 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ENCODING AND DECODING AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2012
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.10.2012  [2012/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2008/16]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LIEBCHEN, Tilman
Lefevrestrasse 17
12161 Berlin / DE
 [2008/16]
Representative(s)Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2008/16]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date06769227.710.07.2006
[2008/16]
WO2006KR02691
Priority number, dateWO2005KR0229216.07.2005         Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002292
WO2005KR0230618.07.2005         Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002306
WO2005KR0230718.07.2005         Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002307
WO2005KR0230818.07.2005         Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002308
US20050700570P19.07.2005         Original published format: US 700570 P
US20050697551P11.07.2005         Original published format: US 697551 P
WO2005KR0229016.07.2005         Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002290
WO2005KR0229116.07.2005         Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002291
[2008/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007008013
Date:18.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1911020
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007
[2008/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT22.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G10L19/00, H04N7/64, G10L19/02
[2010/52]
Former International [2008/16]G10L19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM CODIEREN UND DECODIEREN EINES AUDIOSIGNALS[2008/16]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD OF ENCODING AND DECODING AUDIO SIGNAL[2008/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DESTINES AU CODAGE ET AU DECODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO[2008/16]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2008National basic fee paid 
31.01.2008Search fee paid 
31.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
17.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/41]
25.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  TILMAN LIEBCHEN, "Proposed Study on ISO/IEC 14496-3:2001/FPDAM 4, Audio Lossless Coding (ALS), new audio profiles and BSAC extensions", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050429), no. M12018, XP030040726 [X] 1-20 *Sections X.5.1.1, X.5.1.2, X.5.1.3, X.6.1, X.6.2*;; tables X.8, X.9, X.10, X.16 *
International search[A]EP0691751
 [A]US2004161116
 [A]  TSAI T.-H. ET AL.: 'MPEG-2 audio decoder with efficient data arrangement and memory configuration' IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS vol. 43, no. 3, August 1997, pages 598 - 604, XP000742537

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.628682
 [A]  KAMAMOTO Y. ET AL.: 'Lossless compression of multi-channel signals using inter-channel correlation' TRANSACTIONS OF THE INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN vol. 46, no. 5, May 2005, pages 1118 - 1128, XP008077545