blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2041600 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2041600



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 232
12.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.06.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.06.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.06.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
12.06.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
05.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
05.06.2014 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
23.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.04.2014 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
12.02.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.02.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.02.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
12.02.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
20.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
20.12.2013 Description Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
11.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
29.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
17.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
17.05.2011 Description Search / examination 8
17.05.2011 Drawings Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.02.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
26.01.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
20.01.2009 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
20.01.2009 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
20.11.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.10.2008 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.10.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.10.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.10.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.10.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.10.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.2008 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.10.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.10.2008 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.09.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.09.2008 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.07.2008 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2008 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
30.07.2008 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.06.2008 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
26.05.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.05.2008 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.05.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.05.2008 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.05.2008 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.05.2008 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.05.2008 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.01.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 13
22.08.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.08.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 2
22.08.2006 Description International Searching Authority 8
22.08.2006 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
22.08.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 2