blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2041600


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
26.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2016  [2016/13]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
07.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
10.07.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
22.05.2015 Change - representative
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
01.08.2014 (Expected) grant published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.06.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.02.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  25.07.2012  [2012/30]
28.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.05.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.02.2011 First examination report
09.02.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.04.2009  [2009/14]
27.02.2009 Request for examination filed published on  01.04.2009  [2009/14]
17.02.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
22.11.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication