blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2041600
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2008007964Global Dossier 17.01.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2006NO00276 13.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7855674Global Dossier 21.12.2010B2
US2009315754 24.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2006NO00276 13.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2041600Global Dossier 03.09.2014B1
EP2041600 01.04.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2006NO00276 13.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2683096 17.01.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2006NO00276 13.07.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101484827B 15.08.2012B
CN101484827 15.07.2009A
Priority number Date
WO2006NO00276 13.07.2006