Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2041600

EP2041600 - A METHOD AND RADAR SYSTEM FOR COHERENT DETECTION OF MOVING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/14]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
Ericsson AB Patent Service Layer & Multimedia
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / VALAND, Per Atle
Etterstadsletta 76
N-0659 Oslo / NO
 [2009/14]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Vejgaard, Christian
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Antennas and Microwaves
Lindholmspiren 11
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2009/14]Vejgaard, Christian
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Antennas and Microwaves Lindholmspiren 11
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date06769446.313.07.2006
[2009/14]
WO2006NO00276
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008007964
Date:17.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2041600
Date:01.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008
[2009/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2041600
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/10, G01S13/524
[2009/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND RADARSYSTEM ZUR KOHÄRENTEN DETEKTION BEWEGLICHER OBJEKTE[2009/14]
English:A METHOD AND RADAR SYSTEM FOR COHERENT DETECTION OF MOVING OBJECTS[2009/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME RADAR POUR DÉTECTION COHÉRENTE D'OBJETS EN MOUVEMENT[2009/14]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2009National basic fee paid 
26.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/14]
14.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.04.2014Fee for grant paid
23.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.02.2011
Opposition(s)04.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.07.2006
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/33]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2016/13]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/34]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT03.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US4768035  (THURBER ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-15,1-15,1-15 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 59 * * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 59 * * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 59 * * abstract *;
 [X]US4626856  (PIERSON WILLIS A [US], et al) [X] 1-15,1-15,1-15 * column 1, line 59 - line 67 * * column 3, line 26 - column 8, line 21; figures 1,2,6,7 * * column 1, line 59 - line 67 * * column 3, line 26 - column 8, line 21; figures 1,2,6,7 * * column 1, line 59 - line 67 * * column 3, line 26 - column 8, line 21; figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [X]US3903525  (MULLINS WILLIAM H, et al) [X] 1-15,1-15,1-15 * column 5, line 32 - line 53; figure 2 * * column 6, line 39 - line 48; figure 3 * * column 7, line 7 - line 38 * * column 27, line 40 - line 43 * * column 5, line 32 - line 53; figure 2 * * column 6, line 39 - line 48; figure 3 * * column 7, line 7 - line 38 * * column 27, line 40 - line 43 * * column 5, line 32 - line 53; figure 2 * * column 6, line 39 - line 48; figure 3 * * column 7, line 7 - line 38 * * column 27, line 40 - line 43 *;
 [X]US4040055  (DONAHUE THOMAS H, et al) [X] 1-15,1-15,1-15 * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 38 * * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 38 * * abstract * * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 38 * * abstract *
Examination US6271786
  US5278566
by applicantUS4768035
 US6420995