Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2021079
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.07.2010 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
09.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
05.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|