Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021079

EP2021079 - VENTILATION INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Respcare, Inc.
6601 Lyons Rd. St. B1-B4
Coconut Creek, FL 33073 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / CHANDRAN, Sanjay
19483 Estuary Dr.
Boca Raton, FL 33498 / US
02 / HERNANDEZ, Shara
2995 Sw 117 Ave.
Davie, FL 33330 / US
03 / COLLAZO, Louis, Javier
1505 N. Riverside Dr., 404
Pompano Beach, FL 33062 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Neobard, William John , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Neobard, William John , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06770870.123.05.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006US19776
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136376
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021079
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A62B17/04, A62B7/10, A62B18/02, A62B18/08, A61B16/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BELÜFTUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE[2009/07]
English:VENTILATION INTERFACE[2009/07]
French:INTERFACE DE VENTILATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
05.07.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004226566  (GUNARATNAM MICHAEL K [AU], et al);
 [Y]US6513526  (KWOK PHILIP RODNEY [AU], et al)