Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1890998

EP1890998 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYISOCYANATES OF THE DIPHENYLMETHANE SERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
[2008/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Richard C.
Glan Y Dwr
Glasinfryn, Bangor Gwynedd LL57 4UP / GB
02 / CARR, Robert H.
A.E. Verbiststraat 34
B-3060 Bertem / BE
 [2008/09]
Representative(s)Kourgias, Catherine , et al
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA
Intellectual Property Department
Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Swinnen, Anne-Marie , et al
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
Former [2008/09]Swinnen, Anne-Marie , et al
Huntsman (Europe) BVBA, Intellectual Property Dept., Everslaan 45
3078 Everberg / BE
Application number, filing date06771056.623.05.2006
[2008/09]
WO2006US20065
Priority number, dateEP2005010460830.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05104608
[2008/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006130405
Date:07.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1890998
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006
[2008/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1890998
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.02.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C263/10, C07C263/20, C07C265/14, C08G18/76
[2011/36]
Former International [2008/09]C07C249/14, C07C263/04, C07C263/18, C07C251/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ZUBEREITUNG VON POLYISOCYANATEN DER DIPHENYLMETHAN-SERIE[2008/09]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYISOCYANATES OF THE DIPHENYLMETHANE SERIES[2008/09]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYISOCYANATES DE LA SERIE DIPHENYLMETHANE[2008/09]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2008National basic fee paid 
02.01.2008Search fee paid 
02.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/09]
24.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2014Fee for grant paid
07.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.11.2014  12.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association, et al
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/15]
Opponent(s)01  21.11.2014  12.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association, et al
BASF SE
ZRX-C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2015/01]
Opponent(s)01  21.11.2014   
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Stängle, Michael Andreas Walter, et al
BASF SE
Global Intellectual Property
GVX - C6
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
15.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0089/17
21.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
IE23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2016/25]AT26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2015/21]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE23.05.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2015/09]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU23.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2015/04]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU23.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XD]DE10245584  (BASF AG) [XD] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * claims 1,7 *;
 [XD]WO0100569  (BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT; REIF, MARTIN; VAN DEN ABEEL, PETER; NEVEJANS,) [XD] 1-4,7-10 * examples 1-3; claims 1,3-7 *;
 [XD]WO2004056756  (BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT; SOHN, MARTIN; STROEFER, ECKHARD; NEVEJANS, FI) [XD] 1-4,7,8 * page 26, line 38 - page 27, line 16 * * page 27, lines 39-42; example 3 * * claims 1-7,13,14 *;
 [XD]DE4232769  (BASF AG, 67063 LUDWIGSHAFEN, DE) [XD] 1-4,6-10 * page 3, lines 15-21,61,62 * * page 3, line 65 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, lines 29-40; examples 3,4 * * claims 1-3,6 *
International search[X]US6576788