Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1901701

EP1901701 - PERSONAL CARE AND MEDICINAL PRODUCTS INCORPORATING BOUND ORGANOSULFUR GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.11.2014  [2014/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ott, David M.
777 Panoramic Way
Berkeley, CA 94704 / US
[2008/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Forrest, Graham Robert , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/13]Forrest, Graham Robert , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date06771198.624.05.2006
[2008/13]
WO2006US20281
Priority number, dateUS20050684357P24.05.2005         Original published format: US 684357 P
[2008/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006127918
Date:30.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1901701
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006
[2008/13]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US04.06.2009
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/00, A61K8/44, A61Q11/00, A61P17/00, A61P43/00, A61K9/00, A61K36/8962
[2012/18]
Former International [2009/30]A61K8/00
Former International [2008/13]A61K8/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/13]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÖRPERPFLEGE- UND MEDIZINISCHE PRODUKTE MIT GEBUNDENEN SCHWEFELORGANISCHEN GRUPPEN[2008/13]
English:PERSONAL CARE AND MEDICINAL PRODUCTS INCORPORATING BOUND ORGANOSULFUR GROUPS[2008/13]
French:PRODUITS MEDICAUX ET D'HYGIENE PERSONNELLE COMPRENANT DES GROUPES ORGANOSULFUREUX LIES[2008/13]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2007National basic fee paid 
19.12.2007Search fee paid 
19.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/13]
27.12.2011Observations by third parties
02.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/47]
15.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.10.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201409   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE202004012348U  (JABAL AMMAN SUHBI HASAN MOHAMM [JO]) [X] 1-3,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 4-10;
 [XI]AU1736299  (PISATURO RICCARDO) [X] 1-3,7,8,11-14 * abstract * [I] 4-6,9,10;
 [XI]JP2002173439  (KANAI HIROKO, et al) [X] 1-4,11-14 * abstract * [I] 5-10;
 [XI]JPH05212099  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1,2,9-14 * abstract * [I] 3-8;
 [XI]  - R R Cutler ET AL, "Antibacterial activity of a new, stable, aqueous extract of allicin against methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aures", British Journal of Biomedical Science, (20040101), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.allimax.us/Cutler.pdf, (20120313), XP055021696 [X] 1,2,6-8,11-14 * page 4, columns l-h col, paragraph l * [I] 3-5,9,10
 [T]  - Anonymous, "Garlic", (20120313), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Garlic, (20120313), XP055021710 [T] 1-14 * Properties *
International search[X]US4486403
other   - "Dawa Baraa-e- Taakkul-e- Asnaan", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AA20/230A34J, XP003029117
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, vol. XX, page 218,
    - "Sanoon-e- Saum", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AA3/850, XP003029118
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, vol. III, pages 196 - 197,
    - "Soom-[lahsan]", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AH1/144, XP003029119
    - ABU ALI IBN-E-SINA, AL-QANOON-FIL-TIBB, vol. II, pages 108 - 109,
    - "Zimaad-e- Shaham Mohallil", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. JA7/153S, XP003029120
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, vol. III, page 89,
    - "Zimaad Bara-e Waram", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. JA6/852M, XP003029121
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, vol. III, page 696,