Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012225053 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US20542 | 24.05.2006 | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | US92097306 | 24.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008542300 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US20542 | 24.05.2006 | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006249771 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US20542 | 24.05.2006 | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1883416 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2013 | A4 | EP1883416 | 06.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US20542 | 24.05.2006 | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0610180 | 25.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US20542 | 24.05.2006 | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2608651 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US20542 | 24.05.2006 | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006128032 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | A3 | WO2006128032 | 30.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101227916 | 23.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68448705 | 24.05.2005 |