Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1883416

EP1883416 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wellgen, Inc.
63 Dudley Road
New Brunswick NJ 08901-8520 / US
[2008/06]
Inventor(s)01 / DUSHENKOV, Slavik
224-a Warren Avenue
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
02 / EVANS, David
64 Harlingen Road
Belle Mead, NY 08502 / US
03 / LUCAS-SCHNARRE, Patricia
44 William Street
Metuchen, NJ 08840 / US
04 / HIRSCH, Julie, Beth
15 Mill Lane
Branchburg, NJ 08876 / US
 [2008/06]
Representative(s)Peters, Hajo , et al
ZACCO GmbH
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/39]Peters, Hajo , et al
Albihns Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/29]Peters, Hajo , et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/52]Peters, Hajo , et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/40]Peters, Hajo , et al
Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/15]Peters, Hajo
Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2008/06]Weber-Quitzau, Martin
Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06771356.024.05.2006
[2008/06]
WO2006US20542
Priority number, dateUS20050684487P24.05.2005         Original published format: US 684487 P
[2008/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006128032
Date:30.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1883416
Date:06.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006
[2008/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.01.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/82, A61K31/35, A61K31/05, A61P19/02
[2013/24]
Former International [2008/06]A61K36/82, A61K31/35, A61K31/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/06]
Extension statesAL16.11.2007
BA16.11.2007
HR16.11.2007
MK16.11.2007
YU16.11.2007
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ZUSTÄNDEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ENTZÜNDUNGEN[2008/06]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH INFLAMMATION[2008/06]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES POUR LA PREVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE CONDITIONS ASSOCIEES A L'INFLAMMATION[2008/06]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2007National basic fee paid 
16.11.2007Search fee paid 
16.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/06]
18.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2010Observations by third parties
03.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/20]
08.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201106   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2011
31.05.201207   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2012
31.05.201308   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2013
31.05.201409   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2014
31.05.201510   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19627344  (VITASYN GMBH ENTWICKLUNG & VER [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * claims 1,10 *;
 [Y]WO0074662  (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB]; BUTTLE DAVID [GB]; ADCOCKS CLAIR [GB]; COLLIN PET) [Y] 1-26 * claims 1,13,14 *;
 [Y]WO02060393  (THEOHARIDES THEOHARIS C [US]) [Y] 1-26 * examples 2,3,4,11; claims 1,4 *;
 [Y]US2002068718  (PIERCE SCOTT W [US]) [Y] 1-26 * claims 1-2 *;
 [Y]WO03099013  (OMNI NUTRACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-26 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO9422453  (NUTRAMAX LAB INC [US]) [Y] 1-26 * claim - *
International search[X]US2005049284  ;
 [X]US2002146472  ;
 [Y]US6838451
other   - "Chai", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/324, XP003026894
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, pages 342 - 343
    - "Nuskha Matbookh", TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/1083A, XP003026895
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 180
    - "Safoof-e-Santa Barae Dama", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/751F, XP003026896
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, page 746
    - "Dawa Bara-e-Rabw", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/1336, XP003026897
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Iiaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 107
    - "Haridra Arka gunah", TKDL, Database accession no. AK14/51B, XP003026898
    - LANKAPATIRA VANA, Arkaprakasah, (1995), vol. 1ST, page 44
    - "Nisadvayagunaah", TKDL, Database accession no. RK/109, XP003026899
    - VAGBHATA, Astanga Samgraha, (1991), vol. I, page 191
    - "Vijaya Kalpah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS13/318Z6, XP003026900
    - MANTHANA BHAIVARA, Anandakandah, (1952), vol. 1ST, page 244
    - "Talakesvararasah (Dvisaptatitamah)", TKDL, Database accession no. SJ/1473, XP003027301
    - Rasayoga Sagara, (1999), vol. I, page 580
    - "Vaatha Soolai kudineer-4", TKDL, Database accession no. AM05/1773, XP003027302
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, Athmarakshaamirtham, (1879), page 457