Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1968529

EP1968529 - WIPER FOR USE WITH DISINFECTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[2014/12]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLARK, James William
63 Doe Run Court
West Chester, Pennsylvania 19382 / US
02 / HUI, Philip Shi Hung
2490 Northwood Drive
Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US
03 / DETAMORE, James J.
634 Cooledge Avenue N.e.
Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Beacham, Annabel Rose
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2009/41]Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2008/38]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date06771890.802.06.2006
[2008/38]
WO2006US21362
Priority number, dateUS2005030075115.12.2005         Original published format: US 300751
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007070090
Date:21.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1968529
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007
[2008/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1968529
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/02, C11D17/04, A01N25/34, C11D1/62
[2017/02]
Former International [2008/38]A61K8/02, C11D17/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2009/02]
Former [2008/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WISCHER ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DESINFEKTIONSMITTELN[2013/26]
English:WIPER FOR USE WITH DISINFECTANTS[2008/38]
French:CHIFFON DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC DES DESINFECTANTS[2008/38]
Former [2008/38]WISCHTUCH ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DESINFEKTIONSMITTELN
Entry into regional phase01.07.2008National basic fee paid 
01.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/38]
16.07.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.08.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
08.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2014Fee for grant paid
04.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.12.2014  22.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2018/37]
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2014  22.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
29.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.2015Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
08.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0718/17
26.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
31.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
01.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE19.03.2014
[2014/37]
Cited inInternational search[X]US5094770  (NORDIC, INC.) [X] 1-20 * examples 1-8; claims 1-50 *;
 [X]US3283357  (J.W. DECKER ET AL.) [X] 1-20 * example 1; claims 1-4 *