Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1902414

EP1902414 - BILLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MICRO-TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS. AC, Inc.
255 G Street, 723
San Diego, CA 92101 / US
[2008/13]
Inventor(s)01 / POUSTI, Michael
255 G Street, 723
San Diego, CA 92101 / US
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/13]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date06772228.006.06.2006
[2008/13]
WO2006US21836
Priority number, dateUS20050687663P06.06.2005         Original published format: US 687663 P
US20050689641P10.06.2005         Original published format: US 689641 P
[2008/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006133141
Date:14.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1902414
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006
[2008/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2008/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/13]
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEBÜHRENBERECHNUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MIKTROTRANSAKTIONEN[2008/13]
English:BILLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MICRO-TRANSACTIONS[2008/13]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE FACTURATION POUR MICROTRANSACTIONS[2008/13]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2008National basic fee paid 
04.01.2008Search fee paid 
04.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/26]
05.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/17]
16.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002143634  ;
 [Y]US2004267618  ;
 [A]US2004267663  ;
 [A]US2003200184