EP1937808 - ENHANCING ENZYME PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protech Research PTY LTD PO Box 64, Seaforth New South Wales 2092 / AU | For all designated states EMU AG Faennring 1 PO Box 36 6403 Kussnacht am Rigi / CH | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATANE, Michael Po Box 64 Seaforth, New South Wales 2092 / AU | 02 /
PARKER, Mitchell Po Box 64 Seaforth, New South Wales 2092 / AU | 03 /
TALWALKAR, Akshat Po Box 64 Seaforth, New South Wales 2092 / AU | 04 /
PARKER, Bernard c/o Bakels Research (PTY) Ltd. 33-47 Derby Street Silverwater, NSW 2128 / AU | [2012/25] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
PATANE, Michael Po Box 64 Seaforth, New South Wales 2092 / AU | ||
02 /
PARKER, Mitchell Po Box 64 Seaforth, New South Wales 2092 / AU | |||
03 /
TALWALKAR, Akshat Po Box 64 Seaforth, New South Wales 2092 / AU | |||
04 /
PARKER, Bernard c/o Bakels Research (PTY) Ltd. 33-47 Derby Street Silverwater, NSW 2128 / AU | Representative(s) | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/27] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06774871.5 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006AU01242 | Priority number, date | AU20050904664 | 26.08.2005 Original published format: AU 2005904664 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007022598 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937808 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937808 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/14, A01H5/10 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
C12N9/14 (EP,US);
C12N9/2414 (EP,US);
C12N9/2422 (EP,US);
C12N9/2425 (EP,US);
C12N9/2434 (EP,US);
C12N9/2451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | VERBESSERN DER ENZYMPRODUKTION | [2008/27] | English: | ENHANCING ENZYME PRODUCTION | [2008/27] | French: | AUGMENTATION DE LA PRODUCTION D' ENZYMES | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2006 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3754929 (PALMER G) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11,12,14,18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8504556 (LEWIS VICTOR MARCUS, et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0147364 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5045328 (LEWIS VICTOR M [AU], et al) [A] * the whole document * | [X] - HIRASAWA ET AL, "EFFECTS OF WOUNDING, ETHYLENE AND ABSCISIC ACID ON THE DEVELOPMENET OF ALPHA-AMYLASE ACTIVITY IN DETACHED COTYLEDONS OF PISUM SATIVUM", JOURNAL OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, FISCHER, STUTTGART, DE, (19940101), vol. 143, ISSN 0176-1617, pages 359 - 362, XP008077178 [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,14,18,19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US3754929 (PALMER G); | [X] - ICHINOSE Y. ET AL., "Effects of increase in alpha-amylase and endo-protease activities during germination on the breadmaking quality of wheat", FOOD SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 214 - 219, XP008077180 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3136/fstr.7.214 | [X] - HIRASAWA E. ET AL., "Effects of wounding, ethylene and abscisic acid on the development of alpha-amylase activity in detached cotyledons of Pisum sativum", JOURNAL OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 143, pages 359 - 362, XP008077178 | [X] - MOOT D.J. AND EVERY D., "A comparison of bread baking, falling number, alpha-amylase assay and visual method for the assessment of pre-harvest sprouting in wheat", JOURNAL OF CEREAL SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 11, pages 225 - 234, XP008077179 | [X] - SCHLIMME G., "Abrasian of winer barley (Schleifen von Wintergerste)", BRAUWELT, (1977), vol. 117, no. 49, pages 1894 - 1895, XP008077177 | [X] - DIEDERING P., "Colloidal behaviour and enzymic degradation of starch and a contribution on decreasing sprout injury", Z. GES. GETREIDEW., (1943), vol. 30, pages 1 - 17 |