EP1925663 - TWO-STEPS ENZYME METHOD FOR PREPARING 7-AMINOCEPHALOSPORANIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GeneHarbor (Hong Kong) Technologies Limited Units 506-507, Bio-Informatics Centre No. 2 Science Park West Avenue Hong Kong Science Park, Shatin, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Bioright Worldwide Company Limited TrustNet Chambers, P.O. Box 3444 Road Town Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jun 23D, Block 5, Royal Ascort, Fo Tan, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
TSANG, Waikei 2101, Ming Cheong House, Ming Nga Court, Tai Po, N .T.; Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
YAP, Hongkin 81B, Yuen Leng Village, Tai Po, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Junmin Room 501, Block 4, Fulian Garden, Futian Shenzhen / CN | 05 /
SIU, Yaulung Flat G, 16/F, Fung Cheung House, 17 Wan Fung Stree t, Wong Tai Sin, Kowloon; Hong Kong / CN | 06 /
TSANG, Supyin Flat D. 7/F, On Tai Building, 68 Mei King Street, Tokwawan, Kowloon; Hong Kong / CN | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Zippelhaus 5 20457 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06775270.9 | 02.08.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006CN01940 | Priority number, date | CN2005189965 | 08.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510089965 | [2008/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007016861 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925663 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/06, C12N9/14, C12N15/70, C12N15/72, C12P21/02, C12P35/06 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
C12P35/02 (EP,US);
C12N9/0024 (EP,US);
C12P35/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEISCHRITT-ENZYMVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 7-AMINOCEPHALOSPORANSÄURE | [2008/22] | English: | TWO-STEPS ENZYME METHOD FOR PREPARING 7-AMINOCEPHALOSPORANIC ACID | [2008/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ENZYMATIQUE EN DEUX ÉTAPES POUR PRÉPARER UN ACIDE 7-AMINOCÉPHALOSPORANIQUE | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | Translation filed | 10.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 12.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0969088 (ANTIBIOTICOS SA [ES]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - BIANCHI DANIELE ET AL, "Enzymatic transformation of cephalosporin C to 7-ACA by simultaneous action of immobilized D-amino acid oxidase and glutaryl-7-ACA acylase", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199805), vol. 73, no. 2-3, ISSN 0273-2289, pages 257 - 268, XP001097486 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02785660 | [X] - NIKOLOV A ET AL, "Enzymatic transformation of cephalosporin C to 7-amino-cephalosporanic acid. Part II: Single-step procedure using a coimmobilized enzyme system", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 0141-0229, (19941201), pages 1037 - 1041, (19941201), XP023679730 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(94)90139-2 | [A] - MATSUDA A ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES OF THE GENES FOR TWO DISTINCT CEPHALOSPORIN ACYLASES FROM A PSEUDOMONAS STRAIN", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19870101), vol. 169, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5821 - 5826, XP008007274 [A] * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1246147 (ANTIBIOTICOS SAU [ES]); | [Y]WO03076640 (BIOFERMA MURCIA S A [ES], et al); | [XP]CN1680558 (BRAY WORLDWIDE LTD [GB]); | [XP]CN1680583 (BRAY WORLDWIDE LTD [VG]) |