Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1933506

EP1933506 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REALIZING THE INTERWORKING OF OAM FUNCTION BETWEEN THE ETHERNET AND THE MPLS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Xixiang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2013/08]
Former [2008/25]01 / LI, Xixiang
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2008/25]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date06775548.830.08.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006CN02231
Priority number, dateCN2005110302215.09.2005         Original published format: CN200510103022
[2008/25]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007031002
Date:22.03.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1933506
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1933506
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/46, // H04L12/26, H04L12/24
[2012/39]
Former International [2008/25]H04L12/46
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REALISIEREN DES INTERWORKING DER OAM-FUNKTION ZWISCHEN DEM ETHERNET UND DEM MPLS-NETZ[2008/25]
English:A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REALIZING THE INTERWORKING OF OAM FUNCTION BETWEEN THE ETHERNET AND THE MPLS NETWORK[2008/25]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A LA REALISATION DE L'INTERCONNEXION DE LA FONCTION OAM ENTRE LES RESEAUX ETHERNET ET MPLS[2008/25]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2008Translation filed 
15.04.2008National basic fee paid 
15.04.2008Search fee paid 
15.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
17.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2012Fee for grant paid
24.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2012
Opposition(s)21.11.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.08.2006
AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
IE30.08.2013
LU30.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
IE30.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
IE30.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/03]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/40]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]  DINI P ET AL, "IP/MPLS OAM: Challenges and Directions A multi-technology, proactive, and autonomic management view", IP OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT, 2004. PROCEEDINGS IEEE WORKSHOP ON BEIJING, CHINA 11-13 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041011), ISBN 978-0-7803-8836-9, pages 1 - 8, XP010886135 [A] 1-25 * page 2, column 2, paragraph II. - page 4, column 1, paragraph IV. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPOM.2004.1547584
 [A]  AISSAOUI M ET AL, "Service convergence using MPLS multiservice networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20050601), vol. 43, no. 6, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 152 - 159, XP011134829 [A] 1-25 * page 156, line 44 - page 157 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2005.1452844
International search[A]EP1388979
 [A]US2004252717
 [A]CN1604545