Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1924429

EP1924429 - DEVICE FOR WINDING UP A STRIP-SHAPED RUBBER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2008/22]
Inventor(s)01 / GEFFERT, Ulrich
Postbrink 1
31848 Bad Münder / DE
02 / KASTENS, Sven
Lutherstrasse 75
30171 Hannover / DE
 [2008/22]
Representative(s)Finger, Karsten
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Patente und Lizenzen
Postfach 169
30001 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]Finger, Karsten
Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169
D-30001 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date06776072.823.06.2006
[2008/22]
WO2006EP06036
Priority number, dateDE2005104156501.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005041565
[2008/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007025583
Date:08.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1924429
Date:28.05.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007
[2008/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1924429
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/16, B29D30/30, B29D30/44
[2008/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFSPULEN EINES STREIFENFÖRMIGEN KAUTSCHUKMATERIALS[2008/22]
English:DEVICE FOR WINDING UP A STRIP-SHAPED RUBBER MATERIAL[2008/22]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT D'UN MATERIAU DE CAOUTCHOUC EN FORME DE BANDE[2008/22]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2008National basic fee paid 
01.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/22]
16.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
AT23.06.2009
LU23.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
AT23.06.2009
LU23.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
AT23.06.2009
LU23.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/19]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
AT23.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/05]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
AT23.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/42]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
AT23.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/28]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
BE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/14]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/07]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/03]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS59207227  ;
 [A]EP0776757  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] - [0009] - [0015] - [0019]; figures 1-10; claims 1,2,5,6 *;
 [A]US5335415  (OKUFUJI YUKITAKA [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 8, line 39 - column 12, line 16; figures 1-9; claims 1-6,9,11,12 *;
 [A]US2003066610  (KOLKER MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; figures 1,2a-2i; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]WO02094545  (MARANGONI MECCANICA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 4, lines 15-22 * * page 10, line 12 - page 12, line 14; figures 4,5; claims 1,5 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850406), vol. 009, no. 077, Database accession no. (M - 369), [A] 1-12 * abstract *