Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1934024

EP1934024 - MINCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2011  [2011/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leifheit AG
Leifheitstrasse
56377 Nassau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/26]For all designated states
LEIFHEIT AG
Leifheitstrasse
56377 Nassau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GROSS, Christian
Habachstrasse 6
57250 Netphen / DE
02 / PAKUSA, Norbert
Gartenstrasse 14
56377 Schweighausen / DE
 [2008/26]
Representative(s)Bungartz, Klaus Peter , et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/34]Bungartz, Klaus Peter , et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
D-50933 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date06776932.318.08.2006
[2008/26]
WO2006EP08136
Priority number, dateDE2005104292408.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005042924
[2008/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007028489
Date:15.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1934024
Date:25.06.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007
[2008/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:B26D3/26, B26D11/00
[2008/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HACKER[2008/26]
English:MINCER[2008/26]
French:HACHOIR[2008/26]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2008National basic fee paid 
08.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/26]
03.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/39]
13.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]DE8529535U
 [X]US3057386
 [A]US4572444