Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1917391

EP1917391 - INORGANIC MIXED FIBRE PRODUCT CONTAINING FIBRE FLOCKS AND GLASS WOOL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER G+H AG
Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/19]
Inventor(s)01 / MEYER, Jens
Platanenstrasse 49
69493 Hirschberg / DE
02 / WEIGERT, Thomas
245 Burke Street
Plains, PA 18705 / US
03 / ZYSIK, Anton
Bechergarten 11
51515 Kürten-Bechen / DE
 [2008/28]
Former [2008/19]01 / MEYER, Jens
Platanenstrasse 49
69493 Hirschberg / DE
02 / WEIGERT, Thomas
Sattlerweg 45
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
03 / ZYSIK, Anton
Bechergarten 11
51515 Kürten-Bechen / DE
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/29]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2008/19]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date06777043.823.08.2006
[2008/19]
WO2006EP08292
Priority number, dateDE2005104007624.08.2005         Original published format: DE102005040076
[2008/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007022974
Date:01.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1917391
Date:07.05.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007
[2008/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1917391
Date:17.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:D04H13/00, E04B1/74, C03B37/00
[2008/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORGANISCHES MISCHFASERPRODUKT MIT ANORGANISCHEN FASERFLOCKEN UND GLASWOLLEFASERN[2008/19]
English:INORGANIC MIXED FIBRE PRODUCT CONTAINING FIBRE FLOCKS AND GLASS WOOL FIBRES[2008/19]
French:PRODUIT DE FIBRES MIXTES ANORGANIQUE CONTENANT DES FLOCONS DE FIBRES ET DES FIBRES DE LAINE VERRE[2008/19]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2008National basic fee paid 
21.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/19]
25.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2013Fee for grant paid
31.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.06.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Knauf Insulation
Rue de Maastricht 95
4600 Visé / BE
Opponent's representative
ARC-IP
ARC-IP sprl
Rue Emile Francqui 4
1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/39]
Opponent(s)01  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Knauf Insulation
Rue de Maastricht 95
4600 Visé / BE
Opponent's representative
ARC-IP
ARC-IP sprl
Rue Emile Francqui 4
1435 Mont Saint-Guibert / BE
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  17.04.2014   
Knauf Insulation
Rue de Maastricht 95
4600 Visé / BE
Opponent's representative
Farmer, Guy Dominic
ARC-IP sprl
rue Emile Francqui, 4
1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE
23.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.12.2016Appeal received
18.10.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/42]
01.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.08.2006
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
AT23.08.2013
IE23.08.2013
LU23.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR17.09.2013
GB17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
AT23.08.2013
IE23.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR17.09.2013
GB17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/51]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
AT23.08.2013
IE23.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR17.09.2013
GB17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/37]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
IE23.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR17.09.2013
GB17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/34]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
IE23.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GB17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/33]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
IE23.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/26]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/24]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/23]CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/21]CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/20]CY17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY17.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/14]CY10.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CY10.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/11]CY10.07.2013
FI17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY10.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/09]LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT17.07.2013
PT18.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19612711  (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN [DE]) [X] 1,9,16 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2004176003  (YANG ALAIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0020] *;
 [A]WO03060218  (SAINT GOBAIN VETROTEX [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 22 *;
 [PA]WO2005080659  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR], et al) [PA] 1-17 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0039] *;
 [A]DE10359902  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER G & H AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] *
by applicantDE19612711
 EP0412878
 WO9616913