Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1926809

EP1926809 - COMPOSITION OF ENHANCED STABILITY AND A PROCESS FOR MAKING SUCH A COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.02.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London
EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/03]For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London
EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2008/32]For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2008/23]For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BATCHELOR, Stephen, Norman
Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
02 / DOMBURG, Bastiaan
Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier Van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 At Vlaardingen / NL
03 / NEWMAN, Mark, Nicholas
Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
04 / RIGBY, Dawn
Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East
Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
 [2008/23]
Representative(s)Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/23]Avila, David Victor , et al
Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford
Bedforshire MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date06777186.508.09.2006
[2008/23]
WO2006EP08848
Priority number, dateGB2005001934722.09.2005         Original published format: GB 0519347
[2008/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007039042
Date:12.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1926809
Date:04.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007
[2008/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1926809
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/40, C11D3/37, C09B67/00
[2008/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2008/23]
English:COMPOSITION OF ENHANCED STABILITY AND A PROCESS FOR MAKING SUCH A COMPOSITION[2008/23]
French:COMPOSITION PRESENTANT UNE STABILITE AMELIOREE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D UNE TELLE COMPOSITION[2008/23]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2008National basic fee paid 
07.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/23]
07.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2010Fee for grant paid
01.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.12.2010  17.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Jump, Timothy John Simon
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 [2012/46]
Former [2011/04]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2010   
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.01.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.05.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.11.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition29.01.2013Appeal received No.  T0239/13
09.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
05.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
22.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.10.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
05.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
IE08.09.2010
LU08.09.2010
HU18.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
[2015/22]
Former [2011/36]AT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
IE08.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/20]AT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/09]AT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
DK17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
PT19.07.2010
Former [2011/05]AT17.03.2010
CY17.03.2010
CZ17.03.2010
EE17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
RO17.03.2010
SE17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
SK17.03.2010
BG17.06.2010
GR18.06.2010
IS17.07.2010
Former [2010/45]AT17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
NL17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
Former [2010/42]AT17.03.2010
FI17.03.2010
LT17.03.2010
LV17.03.2010
PL17.03.2010
SI17.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1577374
 [X]US1925843
 [X]US4721633
 [X]EP1113068
 [XP]WO2006053598