Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1910045

EP1910045 - METHOD OF MACHINING A COMPONENT HAVING A WOODEN MATERIAL AND A COATING, IN PARTICULAR A BOARD OR A PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/16]METHOD OF MACHINING A COMPONENT HAVING A WOODEN MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR A BOARD OR A PANEL
[2008/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritz Egger GmbH & Co.
Tiroler Strasse 16
3105 Unterradlberg / AT
[2008/16]
Inventor(s)01 / REITER, Bruno
Weitauweg 25a
A-6480 St. Johann In Tirol / AT
 [2008/16]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/16]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date06777704.511.07.2006
[2008/16]
WO2006EP64104
Priority number, dateDE2005103634529.07.2005         Original published format: DE102005036345
[2008/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007012561
Date:01.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1910045
Date:16.04.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1910045
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:B27M1/06
[2008/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/16]
Extension statesAL17.12.2007
BA17.12.2007
HR17.12.2007
MK17.12.2007
RS17.12.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES EIN HOLZMATERIAL UND EINE BESCHICHTUNG AUFWEISENDEN BAUTEILS, INSBESONDERE EINER PLATTE ODER EINES PANEELS[2008/45]
English:METHOD OF MACHINING A COMPONENT HAVING A WOODEN MATERIAL AND A COATING, IN PARTICULAR A BOARD OR A PANEL[2008/45]
French:PROCEDE D'USINAGE D'UN COMPOSANT PRESENTANT UN MATERIAU EN BOIS ET UN REVETEMENT, EN PARTICULIER UNE PLAQUE OU UN PANNEAU[2008/45]
Former [2008/16]VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES EIN HOLZMATERIAL AUFWEISENDEN BAUTEILS, INSBESONDERE EINER PLATTE ODER EINES PANEELS
Former [2008/16]METHOD OF MACHINING A COMPONENT HAVING A WOODEN MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR A BOARD OR A PANEL
Former [2008/16]PROCEDE D'USINAGE D'UN COMPOSANT PRESENTANT UN MATERIAU EN BOIS, EN PARTICULIER UNE PLAQUE OU UN PANNEAU
Entry into regional phase17.12.2007National basic fee paid 
17.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/16]
17.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2008Fee for grant paid
19.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/33]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/05]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/14]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/04]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2006031169  (PERGO EUROP AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1-8 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 7; figure 1 *;
 [X]JPS60127102  ;
 [X]US6647690  (MARTENSSON GORAN [SE]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, lines 7-11; figure - *;
 [X]US4469931  (MACKEN JOHN A [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, lines 49-52 *;
 [X]WO9525621  (SELTMAN JOACHIM W O [SE]) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 6 *;
 [A]US5357728  (DUNCANSON ROBERT J [TH]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, lines 53-64 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, Database accession no. 1992-232090, XP002400053 & JPS60127102 A 19850706 (DAIKEN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column A; figures 3,4 *