Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1922524

EP1922524 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A RATE OF ROTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2018/45]
Former [2008/35]For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
Former [2008/21]For all designated states
Siemens VDO Automotive AG
Siemensstrasse 12
93056 Regensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MAYER-WEGELIN, Raphael
Birkenweg 13
61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE
02 / MORELL, Heinz-Werner
Im Wiesental 34
67659 Kaiserslautern / DE
 [2008/33]
Former [2008/21]01 / MAYER-WEGELIN, Raphael
Jakob-Lengfelder-Str. 44
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
02 / MORELL, Heinz-Werner
Im Wiesental 34
67659 Kaiserslautern / DE
Application number, filing date06778340.724.08.2006
[2008/21]
WO2006EP65618
Priority number, dateDE2005104302509.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005043025
[2008/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007028720
Date:15.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1922524
Date:21.05.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007
[2008/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1922524
Date:24.12.2008
Language:DE
[2008/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1922524
Date:07.11.2018
Language:DE
[2018/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01C19/56, G01P9/04
[2008/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2018/45]
Former [2008/40]DE,  FR,  IT 
Former [2008/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERMITTELN EINER DREHRATE[2008/21]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A RATE OF ROTATION[2008/21]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER UNE VITESSE DE ROTATION[2008/21]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2008National basic fee paid 
01.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
10.04.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.05.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
15.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2008Fee for grant paid
11.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited C/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close Andover
Hampshire SP 10 3FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/31]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited C/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close Andover
Hampshire SP 10 3FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2013/27]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited C/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close Andover
Hampshire SP 10 3FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2011/47]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited C/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close Andover
Hampshire SP 10 3FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bailey, Richard Alan
Marks & Clerk LLP 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
Former [2010/52]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited C/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close Andover
Hampshire SP 10 3FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor
c/o Impetus IP Limited Willemstrew Park Lamerton, Tavistock
Devon PL19 8PZ / GB
Former [2010/34]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Clittaford Road Southway
Plymouth, PL6 6DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor
c/o Impetus IP Limited Willemstrew Park Lamerton, Tavistock
Devon PL19 8PZ / GB
Former [2009/44]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2009  21.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Atlantic Inertial Systems Limited
Clittaford Road Southway
Plymouth, PL6 6DE / GB
Opponent's representative
Bingham, Ian Mark
IP Asset LLP Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford
Oxfordshire OX2 7HT / GB
02.11.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.05.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.04.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.01.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.09.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition12.06.2013Appeal received No.  T1366/13
12.08.2013Statement of grounds filed
12.01.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT24.08.2010
[2011/33]
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2005001381  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; BETZ UWE [DE]; MORELL HEINZ-WERNER [DE]; SKORUPA RAPH) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 7 * [Y] 2;
 [XY]WO2004046649  (BAE SYSTEM PLC [GB]; MALVERN ALAN RICHARD [GB]; REILLY RICHARD HAROLD) [X] 5,6,9 * abstract * * page 5, line 29 - page 7, line 6; figure - * [Y] 2
OppositionJP2001116553
 US6915215
 US6089089
    - PEARCE CH., "The performance and future development of a MEMS SIVSG and its application to the SiIMU", SYMPOSIUM GYRO TECHNOLOGY, (2001), pages 6.1 - 6.10
    - Evidence of SiMU02 sale
    - National Physical Laboratory, "What is the difference between calibration and adjustment" 07.09.2009
    - Schematic of SiMIMU02
    - Comparison between D2 and opposed patent
    - WO2003/078302
    - US 7,240,533
    - US 5,419,194