Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1922524 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1922524



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 873
11.10.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.10.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.10.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
22.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.08.2018 Amended description with annotations Opposition 5
22.08.2018 Description Opposition 5
22.08.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 20
22.08.2018 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
22.08.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.08.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 2
22.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.07.2018 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Opposition 1
28.06.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
15.06.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
15.06.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 3
15.06.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
15.06.2018 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 20
17.05.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 4
06.03.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.02.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
15.02.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.02.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 21
22.01.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.01.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
22.01.2018 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
18.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 26
12.12.2017 Claims Appeal 25
12.12.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
12.12.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
12.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.12.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
12.12.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
06.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.12.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
16.10.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
16.10.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 13
11.10.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.09.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.04.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2014 Claims Appeal 3
22.02.2014 Claims Appeal 3
22.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
22.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
22.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
22.02.2014 Claims Appeal 3
22.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
19.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 15
19.02.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
13.01.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.01.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.01.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.08.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.08.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
19.08.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.08.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
19.08.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
19.08.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
12.08.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
19.06.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.06.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.06.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
12.06.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
12.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.06.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.06.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
04.06.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
24.05.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
23.05.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
22.05.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
10.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
09.05.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
02.04.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 19
02.04.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
02.04.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.04.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
02.04.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.03.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 17
08.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.02.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.02.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.02.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.09.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
26.09.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.09.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
09.06.2011 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Opposition 1
09.06.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
01.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
19.07.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
21.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
12.05.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
08.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
02.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.11.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.09.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.09.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.09.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.09.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
11.09.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
11.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
27.11.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.11.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
11.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.08.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
24.07.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.07.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 7
15.07.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.07.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.07.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.07.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
27.06.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
15.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
28.04.2008 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 24
23.04.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.03.2008 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
18.03.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
07.02.2008 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
07.02.2008 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 General authorisation Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 General authorisation Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
18.01.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.12.2007 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
13.12.2007 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2007 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2007 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.12.2007 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.12.2007 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.12.2007 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.12.2007 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.12.2007 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.07.2007 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
24.05.2007 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.05.2007 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.05.2007 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
14.05.2007 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.05.2007 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
14.05.2007 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
04.04.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
15.03.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
24.08.2006 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
24.08.2006 Annex PCT receiving Office 4
24.08.2006 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
24.08.2006 Description PCT receiving Office 13
24.08.2006 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3