EP1904803 - WEAPON PROVIDED WITH SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A BREECH MOVEMENT BY ROTATING A SHOOTING GRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lupin, Regis 25 Rue de la Paix 73000 Chambery / FR | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe Novagraaf Switzerland S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle SA Avenue de Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Vigand, Philippe William Blanc & Cie Avenue de Pailly 25 CH-1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 06778596.4 | 15.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006FR01351 | Priority number, date | FR20050006240 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506240 | [2008/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006136681 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1904803 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1904803 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F41C7/06, F41A3/72 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
F41A3/72 (EP);
F41A19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WAFFE MIT SYSTEM ZUR VERSCHLUSSBEDIENUNG DURCH DREHUNG DES ABZUGSGRIFFES | [2008/14] | English: | WEAPON PROVIDED WITH SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A BREECH MOVEMENT BY ROTATING A SHOOTING GRIP | [2008/14] | French: | ARME A FEU AVEC COMMANDE DU MOUVEMENT DE LA CULASSE PAR ROTATION DE LA POIGNEE DE TIR | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | IE | 03.06.2009 | IT | 03.06.2009 | LT | 03.06.2009 | LV | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | PL | 03.06.2009 | RO | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | LU | 15.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | ES | 14.09.2009 | IS | 03.10.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
IS | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 03.06.2009 | |
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 03.06.2009 | |
LT | 03.06.2009 | ||
LV | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2383044 (CRAIG ROSCOE J) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE1079992 (NORBERT BORK) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE1126774 (NORBERT BORK) [X] 1,7 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [Y] 8; | [A]DE2213744 (WALTHER C FA) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [X]DE3528793 (KRIEGESKORTE & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5148619 (BADALI JOSEPH A [US]) [Y] 8 * figure 1 * |