Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1910769

EP1910769 - SYSTEM FOR MAINTAINING THE ARROW OF A FISHING GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beuchat International (SA)
34 Avenue de Boisbaudran
13015 Marseille / FR
[2008/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ALVAREZ de TOLEDO, Marc
12, Bd Rivet
F-13008 Marseille / FR
02 / BUREL, Philippe
84, Bd Piot
F-13008 Marseille / FR
 [2008/16]
Representative(s)Roman, Michel
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/16]Roman, Michel
CABINET ROMAN, 35, rue Paradis, B.P. 2224
13207 Marseille Cédex 01 / FR
Application number, filing date06778602.016.06.2006
[2008/16]
WO2006FR01365
Priority number, dateFR2005000610616.06.2005         Original published format: FR 0506106
[2008/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006134278
Date:21.12.2006
Language:FR
[2006/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1910769
Date:16.04.2008
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1910769
Date:24.03.2010
Language:FR
[2010/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:F41B7/04, F41B11/08
[2008/16]
Designated contracting statesES,   GR,   IT,   PT,   TR [2008/45]
Former [2008/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM HALTEN DES PFEILS EINES FISCHGEWEHRS[2008/16]
English:SYSTEM FOR MAINTAINING THE ARROW OF A FISHING GUN[2008/16]
French:SYSTEME DE MAINTIEN DE LA FLECHE SUR UNE ARBALETE DE CHASSE SOUS-MARINE[2008/16]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2007National basic fee paid 
05.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/26]
17.01.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.06.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK
11.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2010Fee for grant paid
05.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200904   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipTR24.03.2010
GR25.06.2010
PT26.07.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2011/09]GR25.06.2010
PT26.07.2010
Former [2011/05]GR25.06.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US4206740  (LYDON, EDWARD B) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 3; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]FR1227045  (VILARRUBIS Y SAGUE, S. A) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 4; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR1276824  (BARJAVEL J) [A] * page 3, column 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5524603  (MENZER ET AL) [A] * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 34; figure 7a *