Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1922237

EP1922237 - DOLLY AND LID COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K.Hartwall Limited
Queensway Industrial Estate Glenrothes
Fife KY7 5QJ / GB
[2009/28]
Former [2008/21]For all designated states
K.Hartwall Limited
Green Lane Industrial Estate Spennymoor Co.
Durham DL16 6BP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / THOMPSON, David, Andrew
21 Weymouth Drive Biddick Woods
Houghton Le Spring DH4 7TQ / GB
02 / JAMES, Michael
8 Babbacombe Way Hucknall
Nottinghamshire NG15 6NW / GB
 [2008/21]
Representative(s)Hulse, Thomas Arnold
Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/21]Hulse, Thomas Arnold
Hulse & Co, St. James House, 2nd Floor, Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
Application number, filing date06779247.331.08.2006
[2008/21]
WO2006GB03225
Priority number, dateGB2005001808706.09.2005         Original published format: GB 0518087
[2008/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007028958
Date:15.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1922237
Date:21.05.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007
[2008/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1922237
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:B62B3/16
[2008/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WAGEN- UND DECKELKOMBINATION[2008/21]
English:DOLLY AND LID COMBINATION[2008/21]
French:ASSOCIATION DE CHARIOT ET COUVERCLE[2008/21]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2008National basic fee paid 
21.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
13.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2009Fee for grant paid
07.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE31.08.2009
LU31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
IE31.08.2009
LU31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2011/22]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE31.08.2009
LU31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2011/05]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/42]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/15]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/04]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005028276
 [A]EP0807586
 [A]US2004195793
 [A]US5186330