Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2074600

EP2074600 - MOBILE NETWORKED GAMING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Partygaming IA Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM 11 / BM
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
Partygaming Ia Limited
Clarendon House 2 Church Street
Hamilton HM 11 / BM
Inventor(s)01 / HARTMANN, Andreas
411 Coral Reef
Ocean Village / GI
02 / SIEZENS, Sander
43A Arlington Gardens
London, W4 4EZ / GB
03 / O'MALLEY, Michael
1495 Upland Hills Dr. N
Upland, CA 92663 / US
 [2009/27]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Rummler, Felix , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co Martiusstraße 5/III. OG
80802 München / DE
Former [2009/27]Rummler, Felix , et al
Jenkins & Co Martiusstrasse 5
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date06779938.726.07.2006
[2009/27]
WO2006IB02153
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008012594
Date:31.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2074600
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/32
[2009/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/27]
TitleGerman:MOBILES VERNETZTES SPIELSYSTEM[2009/27]
English:MOBILE NETWORKED GAMING SYSTEM[2009/27]
French:SYSTÈME MOBILE DE JEU EN RÉSEAU[2009/27]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2009National basic fee paid 
25.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
02.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/49]
22.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.10.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/49]
Appeal following examination01.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1394/16
29.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
01.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]US6117013  (EIBA PETER [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, lines 30-36,62-67 * * column 3, lines 1-11 *;
 [X]WO2006005786  (IDEFACT OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, lines 15-24 * * page 2, lines 13,14 *
by applicantUS6117013
 WO2006005786