Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023526

EP2023526 - CLIENT DEVICE, MAIL SYSTEM, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.05.2015
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.2015  [2015/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ogawa, Keiko
Santoa Nishinippori 3-25-7-902, Higashiogu Arakawa-ku
Tokyo 116-0012 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / OZAKI, Hirotsugu
T.T.T Kabushikikaisha MSB-21 Minami Otsuka Building 2-37-5, Minamiotsuka Toshima-ku
Tokyo 170-0005 / JP
02 / OGAWA, Keiko
T.T.T Kabushikikaisha MSB-21 Minami Otsuka Building 2-37-5, Minamiotsuka Toshima-ku
Tokyo 170-0005 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Jackson, Martin Peter
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06782008.431.07.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006JP315130
Priority number, dateJP2006015019330.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006150193
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138717
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023526
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/00, G06F13/00, H04L12/58, H04L29/06
[2013/39]
Former International [2009/07]H04L9/10, G06F13/00, H04L12/58
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:CLIENT-EINRICHTUNG, MAIL-SYSTEM, PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2009/07]
English:CLIENT DEVICE, MAIL SYSTEM, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF CLIENT, SYSTÈME DE MESSAGERIE ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008Translation filed 
21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Search fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
04.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/25]
30.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO2005015827  (TOTAL TELECOMM TECHNOLOGY CO L [JP], et al) [YD] 1-4 * abstract *;
 []EP1653660  (TOTAL TELECOMM TECHNOLOGY CO L [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0090] - [0122] *;
 [Y]EP1503562  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0027] *;
 [Y]EP1249981  (NUMEME LTD [IE]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0083] *;
 [A]EP1536601  (TOTEMO AG [CH]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] *