Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1919945

EP1919945 - MUTANT OF GRANULOCYTE-COLONY STIMULATING FACTOR(G-CSF) AND CHEMICALLY CONJUGATED POLYPEPTIDE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mogam Biotechnology Research Institute
341 Pojung-dong, Kiheung-ku
Yongin-si, Kyonggi-do 446-799 / KR
[2008/20]
Inventor(s)01 / KANG, Kwan-Yub
341 Pojung-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Kyunggi- do 446-799 / KR
02 / HONG, Jeong-Woon
341 Pojung-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Kyunggi-do 446-799 / KR
 [2008/29]
Former [2008/20]01 / KANG, Kwan-Yub
Hyundai-Morningside Apt, 317-341 570 Bora-dong, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Kyunggi- do 446-582 / KR
02 / HONG, Jeong-Woon
Puyoung Apartment 114-301, Changwoo-dong
Hanam-si, Kyunggi-do 465-710 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/13]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06783354.119.07.2006
[2008/20]
WO2006KR02841
Priority number, dateKR2005006574620.07.2005         Original published format: KR 20050065746
[2008/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007011166
Date:25.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1919945
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007
[2008/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1919945
Date:28.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.01.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/535, A61K47/48
[2008/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/20]
TitleGerman:MUTANTE DES GRANULOZYTENKOLONIESTIMULIERENDEN FAKTORS (G-CSF) UND CHEMISCH KONJUGIERTES POLYPEPTID DAVON[2008/20]
English:MUTANT OF GRANULOCYTE-COLONY STIMULATING FACTOR(G-CSF) AND CHEMICALLY CONJUGATED POLYPEPTIDE THEREOF[2008/20]
French:MUTANT DE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE HÉMATOPOÏÉTIQUE (G-CSF) ET SON POLYPEPTIDE CHIMIQUEMENT CONJUGUÉ[2008/20]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2008National basic fee paid 
18.02.2008Search fee paid 
18.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
08.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2011Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2011Fee for grant paid
19.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09010623.8  / EP2174951
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2009
Opposition(s)03.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.07.2006
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IE19.07.2012
LU19.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IE19.07.2012
LU19.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IE19.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IE19.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/11]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT28.03.2012
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]US6646110  (NISSEN TORBEN LAUESGAARD [DK], et al);
 [A]US2004175800  (COX GEORGE N [US]);
 [A]US2005143563  (PARK MYUNG-OK [KR]);
 [A]EP0727438  (POLYMASC PHARMACEUTICALS PLC [GB])
by applicantUS5824784
    - METCALF, BLOOD, (1986), vol. 67, page 257,
    - YAN ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, no. 3, pages 795 - 799,
    - BENSINGER ET AL., BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, no. 11, pages 3158 - 3163,
    - ROBERTS ET AL., EXPT'L HEMATOLOGY, (1994), vol. 22, pages 1156 - 1163,
    - NEBEN ET AL., BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, no. 7, pages 1960 - 1967,
    - DOCRINOLOGICA., (1988), vol. 119, page 326,
    - CLARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, no. 36, page 21969,
    - BOZZOLA ET AL., J. ENDOCRINOL. INVEST., (1998), vol. 21, page 768,