Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1893942

EP1893942 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RELOCATING AN ARTICULATING-ARM COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 17.08.2011  [2011/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FARO TECHNOLOGIES INC.
125 Technology Park Lake Mary
Florida 32746-6204 / US
[2008/10]
Inventor(s)01 / RAAB, Simon
2692 Sycamore Canyon Road
Santa Barbara, CA 93108 / US
 [2008/10]
Representative(s)Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU
12, rue Boileau
B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2008/10]Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153
69466 Lyon cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date06785365.523.06.2006
[2008/10]
WO2006US24353
Priority number, dateUS20050693295P23.06.2005         Original published format: US 693295 P
[2008/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007002319
Date:04.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1893942
Date:05.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007
[2008/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1893942
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1893942
Date:21.07.2010
[2010/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01B21/04
[2008/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/29]
Former [2008/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZURÜCKSETZUNG EINER GELENKARMKOORDINATENMESSMASCHINE[2008/10]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RELOCATING AN ARTICULATING-ARM COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE[2008/10]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RELOCALISATION D UN APPAREIL DE MESURE DE COORDONNÉES À BRAS ARTICULÉ[2008/10]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2007National basic fee paid 
30.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/10]
27.02.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
31.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2010Fee for grant paid
02.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10159062.8  / EP2202482
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT14.04.2010
FR30.06.2010
[2011/33]
Former [2011/18]IT14.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003206285  (LAU KAM C [US]) [X] 1-11,14 * figures 1,6,7,10,11,14 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0082] - [0084] * * paragraphs [0092] , [0093] *;
 [X]US2003048459  (GOOCH RICHARD MICHAEL [GB]) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] , [0053] *;
 [X]US6069700  (RUDNICK FREDRICK C [US] ET AL) [X] 9-11,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 50 - column 7, line 36 *;
 [X]US4691446  (PITCHES BRIAN E [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 19 *;
 [X]US4714339  (LAU KAM C [US] ET AL) [X] 9-11,14 * the whole document *