Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1902338

EP1902338 - VEHICLE EXTERIOR MIRROR ASSEMBLY WITH BLIND SPOT INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DONNELLY CORPORATION
414 East Fortieth Street
Holland, Michigan 49423 / US
[2008/13]
Inventor(s)01 / LYNAM, Niall R.
281 Norwood Avenue
Holland, Michigan 49424 / US
02 / RUSE, James A.
2584 36th Street
Allegan, Michigan 49010 / US
03 / KENDALL, Craig
13805 Lake Sedge Drive
Grand Haven, Michigan 49417 / US
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2012/16]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2008/13]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date06786337.305.07.2006
[2008/13]
WO2006US26148
Priority number, dateUS20050696953P06.07.2005         Original published format: US 696953 P
US20060784570P22.03.2006         Original published format: US 784570 P
[2008/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007005942
Date:11.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1902338
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007
[2008/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1902338
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/12, B60Q1/26
[2009/45]
Former International [2009/25]G08B5/00
Former International [2008/13]G02B7/182
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/13]
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGAUSSENSPIEGELANORDNUNG MIT TOTPUNKTANZEIGE[2008/13]
English:VEHICLE EXTERIOR MIRROR ASSEMBLY WITH BLIND SPOT INDICATOR[2008/13]
French:ENSEMBLE DE RETROVISEUR EXTERIEUR POUR VEHICULE EQUIPE D'UN INDICATEUR D'ANGLE MORT[2008/13]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2008National basic fee paid 
06.02.2008Search fee paid 
26.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
12.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2012Fee for grant paid
28.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.01.2010
Opposition(s)21.11.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200803   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.2008
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.07.2006
AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
GB05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
LU05.07.2013
ES06.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
GB05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
ES06.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/50]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
GB05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
ES06.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
GB05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/24]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
GB05.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/21]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
GB05.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/03]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/40]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0443185  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,11-17,19-23 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 26 * * page 10, lines 39-53; figure -; claims 1,4,5,15 * [Y] 3-5,8-10,18;
 [AY]US4812814  (ELLIOTT WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1,7,17 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 13; figures 1,2; claim 12 * [Y] 3-5,8-10,18;
 [A]US5313335  (GRAY CRAIG S [US] ET AL) [A] 1,17 * column 1, lines 27-32; figure 1 *
International search[X]US6363326  (SCULLY);
 [Y]US2006056086  (HANNAH)