Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1905211

EP1905211 - TECHNIQUE FOR AUTHENTICATING NETWORK USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avaya Inc.
211 Mt. Airy Road
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920-2311 / US
[2011/03]
Former [2008/14]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAR, Ravi, Chakravarthi
7957 Folkstone Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / LAVIAN, Tal, I.
1294 Caldwell Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
03 / SAHAY, Vasant
1546 Grackle Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
04 / DAS, Nirmalendu
20364 Gillick Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / KUNJUKUNJU, Biju, Sajibahavan
10639 Maplewood Road D
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
06 / LEVI, David, Burton
3501 Kesterwood Drive
Knoxville, TN 37918 / US
07 / MICHELET, Philippe
972 Courtland Court
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
 [2008/14]
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2008/14]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date06787006.311.07.2006
[2008/14]
WO2006US27037
Priority number, dateUS20050698053P11.07.2005         Original published format: US 698053 P
US2005032059330.12.2005         Original published format: US 320593
[2008/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007008976
Date:18.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1905211
Date:02.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007
[2008/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/22
[2008/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2008/42]
Former [2008/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesRSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG VON NETZBENUTZERN[2008/14]
English:TECHNIQUE FOR AUTHENTICATING NETWORK USERS[2008/14]
French:TECHNIQUE SERVANT A AUTHENTIFIER LES UTILISATEURS D'UN RESEAU[2008/14]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2008National basic fee paid 
11.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/14]
05.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
14.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1339199
 [X]EP0465016
 [A]WO0203178