blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1905211 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1905211



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 241
16.04.2014 Closing of application Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.08.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.12.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 36
06.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.12.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
10.02.2010 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
11.12.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.03.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
05.03.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.02.2008 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
20.02.2008 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
28.12.2007 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
24.12.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.12.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
20.12.2007 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
20.12.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
23.11.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.09.2007 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
06.02.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
06.02.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56
18.01.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.01.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
04.09.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.09.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 5
04.09.2006 Description International Searching Authority 21
04.09.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 5