blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1905211


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.04.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
13.01.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.08.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2013 First examination report
12.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.03.2012 Change - representative published on  18.04.2012  [2012/16]
18.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.12.2010 Change - applicant published on  19.01.2011  [2011/03]
17.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2008 Change - designated states published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
12.09.2008 Change - extension states published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
17.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2008 Change - extension states published on  09.04.2008  [2008/15]
29.02.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.04.2008  [2008/14]
29.02.2008 Request for examination filed published on  02.04.2008  [2008/14]
19.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2006 PCT data prior to European publication