blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1905211

Designated contracting statesDE 
GB 
NL 
Examination procedure14.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/21]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2008National basic fee paid 
11.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.04.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20080211
 
Event date:02.04.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE GB NL
 
Event date:09.04.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE GB NL
 
Event date:15.10.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:19.01.2011 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:AVAYA INC.
 
Event date:04.09.2013 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20130805
 
Event date:21.05.2014 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20131217