Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1908077

EP1908077 - IMPROVED READ MODE FOR FLASH MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.06.2010  [2010/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spansion LLC
Technology Law Department 915 DeGuigne Drive, M/S 250 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US
[2008/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Hounien
4352 Sacramento Avenue
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
02 / LEONG, Nancy, S.
10407 Heney Creek Place
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
 [2008/26]
Former [2008/15]01 / CHEN, Hounien
4352 Sacramento Avenue
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
02 / LEONG, Nancy, S.
1338 Fieldtain Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
Representative(s)Eve, Rosemary Margaret
Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]Eve, Rosemary Margaret
Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date06787712.617.07.2006
[2008/15]
WO2006US27852
Priority number, dateUS2005018992327.07.2005         Original published format: US 189923
[2008/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007015863
Date:08.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1908077
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007
[2008/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1908077
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:G11C16/26
[2008/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/34]
Former [2008/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER LESEMODUS FÜR FLASH-SPEICHER[2008/15]
English:IMPROVED READ MODE FOR FLASH MEMORY[2008/15]
French:MODE DE LECTURE AMELIORE POUR UNE MEMOIRE FLASH[2008/15]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2008National basic fee paid 
31.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/15]
28.02.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.03.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
29.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2008Fee for grant paid
15.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.07.2009
[2010/26]
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004062080
 [A]EP1513160
 [A]US2004133755
 [A]US2002041527
 [A]US6178479