Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1871768

EP1871768 - AZABICYCLO (3.1.0) HEXANE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS MODULATORS OF DOPAMINE D3 RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2011
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[2010/52]
Former [2008/01]For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HAMPRECHT, Dieter, GlaxoSmithKline
Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
02 / MAZZONI, Caterina, GlaxoSmithKline
Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
03 / MICHELI, Fabrizio, GlaxoSmithKline
Via Alessandro Fleming 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
 [2008/01]
Representative(s)Mauro, Marina Eliana , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Mauro, Marina Eliana , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property CN925.1 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2008/01]Mauro, Marina Eliana , et al
GlaxoSmithKline S.p.A. Via A. Fleming, 2
I-37135 Verona / IT
Application number, filing date06791503.313.04.2006
[2008/01]
WO2006EP03778
Priority number, dateGB2005000768015.04.2005         Original published format: GB 0507680
[2008/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006136223
Date:28.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1871768
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006
[2008/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1871768
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:C07D403/12, A61K31/403, A61P25/00
[2008/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HR06.11.2007
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AZABICYCLO-(3,1,0)-HEXAN-DERIVATE ALS MODULATOREN VON DOPAMIN-D3-REZEPTOREN[2008/01]
English:AZABICYCLO (3.1.0) HEXANE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS MODULATORS OF DOPAMINE D3 RECEPTORS[2008/01]
French:DÉRIVÉS D'AZABICYCLO[3.1.0]HEXANE UTILES COMME MODULATEURS DES RÉCEPTEURS D3 DE LA DOPAMINE[2008/01]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2007National basic fee paid 
06.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/01]
22.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2010Fee for grant paid
29.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HU29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IE13.04.2011
LU13.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IE13.04.2011
LU13.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2013/25]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IE13.04.2011
LU13.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2012/20]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IE13.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2012/07]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2012/01]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2011/47]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/38]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/37]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/36]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/30]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Former [2011/19]LT29.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[DAP]WO2005080382  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [DAP] 1-27 * examples; claims 1-34 *;
 [A]WO0042037  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,16-27 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9602520  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,16-27 * claims 1,11-13; tables 4,6-8 *;
 [A]WO0198267  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * claim 1 *
 [AD]  - EPSTEIN J W ET AL, "1-ARYL-3-AZABICYCLO[3.1.0]HEXANES, A NEW SERIES OF NONNARCOTIC ANALGESIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1981), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 481 - 490, XP002381888 [AD] 1,10 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00137a002
by applicantWO0240471
 WO2005080382
    - J. MED CHEM, (1981), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 481 - 90
    - SHAH RD ET AL., CURR OPIN DRUG DISC DEV, (2001), vol. 4, pages 764 - 774
    - FREEDMAN TB ET AL., HELV CHIM ACTA, (2002), vol. 85, pages 1160 - 1165
    - DYATKIN AB ET AL., CHIRALITY, (2002), vol. 14, pages 215 - 219
    - SOLLADIE'-CAVALLO A; BALAZ M ET AL., TETRAHEDRON ASSYM, (2001), vol. 12, pages 2605 - 2611
    - NAFIE LA ET AL., Circular dichroism, principles and applications, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2000), pages 97 - 131
    - NAFIE LA ET AL., Infrared and Raman spectroscopy of biological materials, MARCEL DEKKER, (2001), pages 15 - 54
    - POLAVARAPU PL ET AL., J ANAL CHEM, (2000), vol. 366, pages 727 - 734
    - STEPHENS PJ ET AL., CHIRALITY, (2000), vol. 12, pages 172 - 179
    - SOLLADIE' -CAVALLO A ET AL., EUR J ORG CHEM, (2002), pages 1788 - 1796
    - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, Prodrugs as Novel Delivery Systems, PERGAMON PRESS, (1987), vol. 14
    - D. FLEISHER; S. RAMON; H. BARBRA, "Improved oral drug delivery: solubility limitations overcome by the use of prodrugs", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1996), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 115 - 130
    - J. MED. CHEM., (1981), vol. 24, pages 481 - 490
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1955), vol. 77, page 2313
    - SYNLETT, (2002), vol. 5, pages 829 - 831
    - CHENG; PRUSOFF, BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, page 3099
    - SOKOLOFF ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 347, pages 146 - 151
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., CLINICAL NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1993), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 295 - 314
    - LEVANT, PHARMACOL. REV., (1997), vol. 49, pages 231 - 252
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., BRAIN RES. REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 26, pages 236 - 242