Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1940347

EP1940347 - FATTY ACID ESTERS FOR REDUCING THE STICKINESS OF STYLING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KNAPPE, Thorsten
Am Teich 14
22869 Schenefeld / DE
02 / EMMERLING, Winfried
Ahrenloherstr. 24
25436 Tornesch / DE
03 / BAYERSDÖRFER, Rolf
Sülldorfer Mühlenweg 30a
22589 Hamburg / DE
04 / BERGEMANN, Uwe
Paul-Sorge-Str. 34
22459 Hamburg / DE
05 / SCHEFFLER, René
Moortwiete 2s
25479 Ellerau / DE
 [2008/28]
Application number, filing date06791747.631.08.2006
[2008/28]
WO2006EP08504
Priority number, dateDE2005105133325.10.2005         Original published format: DE102005051333
[2008/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007048461
Date:03.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1940347
Date:09.07.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007
[2008/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1940347
Date:09.10.2013
Language:DE
[2013/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/37, A61K8/89, A61K8/892, A61Q5/06
[2008/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FETTSÄUREESTER ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER KLEBRIGKEIT VON STYLINGMITTELN[2008/28]
English:FATTY ACID ESTERS FOR REDUCING THE STICKINESS OF STYLING COMPOSITIONS[2008/28]
French:ESTER D'ACIDE GRAS DESTINE A DIMINUER LE CARACTERE COLLANT D'AGENTS COIFFANTS[2008/28]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2008National basic fee paid 
31.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/28]
24.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2013Fee for grant paid
14.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.09.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.06.2014  09.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  09.07.2014  14.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
L'Oreal, et al
Service D.I.P.I.
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
 [2019/27]
Former [2014/34]
Opponent(s)01  30.06.2014  09.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  09.07.2014  14.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Leray, Noelle, et al
L'Oréal DIPI 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-Sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  30.06.2014   
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
20.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1159/16
25.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1159/16
12.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2006
BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
TR09.10.2013
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
AT31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
[2017/24]
Former [2016/33]HU31.08.2006
BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
TR09.10.2013
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2016/32]HU31.08.2006
BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2016/28]BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
GR10.01.2014
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2016/25]BG09.10.2013
CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/37]CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
BE31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/18]CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
MC09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/41]CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
DK09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/38]CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
IT09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/37]CY09.10.2013
CZ09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
RO09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
SK09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/36]CY09.10.2013
EE09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/28]CY09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
PT10.02.2014
Former [2014/26]CY09.10.2013
ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/25]ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
LV09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/24]ES09.10.2013
FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
PL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/23]FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
IS09.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI09.10.2013
LT09.10.2013
NL09.10.2013
SE09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
Former [2014/20]LT09.10.2013
SI09.10.2013
Former [2014/12]SI09.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005053624  (BASF AG [DE]; MUELLER GABI [DE]; HOESSEL PETER [DE]; WOOD CLAUDIA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 16-25 * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 4 * * page 14, line 7 - page 15, line 11 * * page 40, lines 1-18 *;
 [X]WO2004030642  (BASF AG [DE]; MUELLER GABI [DE]; HOESSEL PETER [DE]; SCHNEIDER TANJA [) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 21 * * page 26, line 23 - line 25 * * page 34, line 26 - line 33 * * page 39, line 24 - line 43 * * page 43, line 32 - page 44, line 7 * * page 57, line 31 - page 58, line 4 *;
 [A]EP0705595  (ROHM & HAAS [US])