Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1928686

EP1928686 - DEVICE FOR LONGITUDINALLY GUIDING A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2008/24]
Inventor(s)01 / HELLMANN, Manfred
Pforzheimer Str. 11
71706 Hardthof / DE
02 / HAGEMANN, Markus
Im Kaisemer 14 A
70191 Stuttgart / DE
 [2008/24]
Application number, filing date06792774.910.08.2006
[2008/24]
WO2006EP65234
Priority number, dateDE2005104501821.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005045018
[2008/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007033867
Date:29.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1928686
Date:11.06.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007
[2008/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1928686
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:B60K31/00
[2008/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2008/42]
Former [2008/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR LÄNGSFÜHRUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS[2008/24]
English:DEVICE FOR LONGITUDINALLY GUIDING A MOTOR VEHICLE[2008/24]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE LONGITUDINAL POUR VEHICULE A MOTEUR[2008/24]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2008National basic fee paid 
21.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/24]
22.04.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.05.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
07.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2008Fee for grant paid
23.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0956993
 [A]DE19931161
by applicant DE19821803
  DE19931161