Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1931616

EP1931616 - NEUTRALIZATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.12.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WEISMANTEL, Matthias
Deutelbacher Str.2
63637 Jossgrund / DE
02 / DE MARCO, Michael
An der Steinbüchse 61
69469 Weinheim / DE
03 / VAN ESBROECK, Dominicus
Vleetweg 12
NL-4725 SN Wouse Plantage / NL
04 / POSSEMIERS, Karl, J.
Hagenlei 50
B-2900 Schoten / BE
05 / DE KAEY, Ronny
Azalealaan 35
B-2531 Vremde / BE
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date06793091.731.08.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006EP65849
Priority number, dateDE2005104260407.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005042604
[2008/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007028751
Date:15.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1931616
Date:18.06.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1931616
Date:29.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/41, C07C57/04, B01J14/00, C08F20/06, C08F220/06
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUTRALISATIONSVERFAHREN[2008/25]
English:NEUTRALIZATION METHOD[2008/25]
French:PROCEDE DE NEUTRALISATION[2008/25]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2008National basic fee paid 
07.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
11.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2013Observations by third parties
04.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2013Fee for grant paid
18.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10173421.8  / EP2360138
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.2014  04.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Opponent's representative
Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/50]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.2014  04.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Opponent's representative
Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.07.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2160/16
18.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2006
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU31.08.2006
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/29]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
IT29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/28]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2016/25]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/51]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/38]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/36]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.08.2014
GB31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/24]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/20]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/18]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
PL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT29.01.2014
IS29.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03095410  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph L - page 8, line 14 * * page 28, line 28 - line 40 * * example .; claim - *;
 [A]DE3432082  (BARTHELL EDUARD, et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP1470905  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0372706
by applicantEP0372706
 EP0574260
 WO03051415
 EP1470905
 WO03095410
    - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, vol. 35, page 35
otherWO03095410
 EP0372706
 WO2005073260
 WO9849221
 WO9404640
 WO9418160
 WO0109273