Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2067255

EP2067255 - Method of control slope regulation and control slope regulation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/24]METHOD OF CONTROL SLOPE REGULATION AND CONTROL SLOPE REGULATION APPARATUS
[2011/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, TX 78735 / US
[2009/24]
Inventor(s)01 / PRATT, Patrick
Gortnagreig
Mallow, 000 / IE
02 / DINEEN, Denis
58 Willow Grove
Ballincollig, 0 / IE
03 / O'BRIEN, Michael
Clonpriest
Youghal, 0 / IE
 [2009/24]
Representative(s)Ferro, Frodo Nunes , et al
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
C/o Optimus Patents Limited
Suite 57a, Basepoint Business Park
Caxton Close, Andover
Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]Ferro, Frodo Nunes , et al
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a, Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close, Andover
Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB
Former [2009/24]Ferro, Frodo Nunes
Impetus IP Limited Grove House, Lutyens Close Chineham
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Application number, filing date06793422.411.09.2006
[2009/24]
WO2006EP66243
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008031454
Date:20.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2067255
Date:10.06.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008
[2009/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2067255
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/02, H03F3/189, H03F3/24, H03G3/30
[2011/44]
Former International [2009/24]H03G3/30, H03F1/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Regelungssteilheit[2011/44]
English:Method of control slope regulation and control slope regulation apparatus[2011/44]
French:Procédé de régulation de pente de commande et appareil de régulation de pente de commande[2011/44]
Former [2009/24]VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERSTEIGUNGSREGELUNG UND STEUERSTEIGUNGSREGELVORRICHTUNG
Former [2009/24]METHOD OF CONTROL SLOPE REGULATION AND CONTROL SLOPE REGULATION APPARATUS
Former [2009/24]PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE PENTE DE COMMANDE ET APPAREIL DE RÉGULATION DE PENTE DE COMMANDE
Entry into regional phase14.04.2009National basic fee paid 
14.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/24]
23.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2012Fee for grant paid
08.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2010
Opposition(s)02.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.09.2006
AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/33]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/22]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/20]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/11]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT21.03.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT21.03.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1463197
 [X]US5278994
 [AD]US2004176049