Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1889336

EP1889336 - ARRANGEMENT FOR SECURELY CONNECTING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE TO AT LEAST TWO OTHER ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2012  [2012/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault SAS
13-15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2008/08]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAUVELIER, Eric
2 allée des Lutins
F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR
02 / MARCHE, Frédéric
1 allée des Prés de Renneuil
F-78590 Noisy Le Roi / FR
03 / MOLLET, Jean-Claude
16 rue des Gaudonnes
F-92380 Garches / FR
 [2008/08]
Representative(s)Rougemont, Bernard , et al
Renault s.a.s
Technocentre
Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36
1, Avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt / FR
[2011/39]
Former [2010/23]Religieux, Vincent
Renault Technocentre Sce 00267 - TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
Former [2008/08]Guyon, Rodolphe C. , et al
Renault Technocentre Service 0267 TCR GRA 236 1, Avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date06794411.610.05.2006
[2008/08]
WO2006FR50426
Priority number, dateFR2005005132723.05.2005         Original published format: FR 0551327
[2008/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007003803
Date:11.01.2007
Language:FR
[2007/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1889336
Date:20.02.2008
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007
[2008/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/64, H01R27/02
[2008/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR SICHEREN VERBINDUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI WEITEREN ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN[2008/08]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR SECURELY CONNECTING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE TO AT LEAST TWO OTHER ELECTRONIC DEVICES[2008/08]
French:AGENCEMENT POUR LE RACCORDEMENT SECURISE D'UN DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE A AU MOINS DEUX AUTRES DISPOSITIFS ELECTRONIQUES[2008/08]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2007National basic fee paid 
27.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/08]
18.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/12]
07.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US5017147  (SUGIYAMA ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 4 *;
 [A]US5727969  (YAMANASHI ET AL);
 [A]WO2004077624  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH; JAHN, MICHAEL; KAEUFL, GEORG);
 [A]US4867699  (ODA ET AL)