Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1972127

EP1972127 - VIRTUAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2009/47]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
British Telecommunications Public Limited Company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SAFFRE, Fabrice, Tristan, Pierre
5 Turing Court Kesgrave
Ipswich Suffolk IP5 2BA / GB
02 / SHACKLETON, Mark, Andrew
142 Whitby Road
Ipswich Suffolk IP5 4AG / GB
 [2008/39]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Barry George William
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department - PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2009/40]
Former [2008/39]Lloyd, Barry George William
British Telecommunications plc Intellectual Property Department PPC5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Application number, filing date06794787.916.10.2006
[2008/39]
WO2006GB03842
Priority number, dateEP2005025711818.11.2005         Original published format: EP 05257118
[2008/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007057633
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1972127
Date:24.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1972127
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2008/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIRTUELLE NETZWERKE[2008/39]
English:VIRTUAL NETWORKS[2008/39]
French:RESEAUX VIRTUELS[2008/39]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2008National basic fee paid 
28.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
09.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2009Fee for grant paid
29.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
IT19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
TR19.08.2009
IE16.10.2009
LU16.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
HU20.02.2010
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
IT19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
IE16.10.2009
LU16.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
HU20.02.2010
Former [2011/22]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
IT19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
IE16.10.2009
LU16.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2011/18]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
IT19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
IE16.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2011/05]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
IE16.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
GR20.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/28]AT19.08.2009
BE19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/26]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
CZ19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
RO19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
SK19.08.2009
MC31.10.2009
BG19.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/20]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
DK19.08.2009
EE19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/18]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
BG19.11.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/16]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
PT21.12.2009
Former [2010/15]AT19.08.2009
CY19.08.2009
FI19.08.2009
LT19.08.2009
LV19.08.2009
NL19.08.2009
PL19.08.2009
SE19.08.2009
SI19.08.2009
ES30.11.2009
IS19.12.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003187974  (BURBECK STEPHEN L ET AL) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0100] *;
 [A]US6604140  (BECK JAMES EDWARD ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 55 * * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 2 *
 [A]  - SAFFRE F ET AL, "SelfService: A Theoretical Protocol for Autonomic Distribution of Services in P2P Communities", ENGINEERING OF COMPUTER-BASED SYSTEMS, 2005. ECBS '05. 12TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AND WORKSHOPS ON THE GREENBELT, MD, USA 04-07 APRIL 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050404), ISBN 0-7695-2308-0, pages 528 - 534, XP010788121 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECBS.2005.1
 [AD]  - M. JELASITY AND O. BABAOGLU, "T-Man: Gossip-based overlay topology management", IN PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ENGINEERING SELF-ORGANISING APPLICATIONS (ESOA'05), Utrecht, (200507), URL: www.cs.unibo.it/babaoglu/papers/esoa05.pdf, (20060330), XP002375152 [AD] 1-14 * page 1 - page 6 *
 [A]  - JELASITY M; GUERRAOUI R; KERMARREC A -M; VAN STEEN M, "The peer sampling service: experimental evaluation of unstructured gossip-based implementations", MIDDLEWARE 2004. ACM/IFIP/USENIX INTERNATIONAL MIDDLEWARE CONFERENCE, Berlin, Germany, vol. 3231, (2004), pages 79 - 98, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/1050000/1045666/p79-jelasity.pdf?key1=1045666&key2=6738373411&coll=GUIDE&dl=GUIDE&CFID=72562304&CFTOKEN=36771820, (20060330), XP002375153 [A] 1-14 * page 79 - page 84 *
 [A]  - EUGSTER P T ET AL M, "Lightweight probabilistic broadcast", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS ACM USA, vol. 21, no. 4, ISSN 0734-2071, (20041104), pages 341 - 374, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/950000/945507/p341-th_eugster.pdf?key1=945507&key2=7557373411&coll=GUIDE&dl=GUIDE&CFID=72561789&CFTOKEN=98635, (20060330), XP002375154 [A] 1-14 * page 342 - page 348 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/945506.945507
 [A]  - JELASITY M ET AL, "Gossip-based aggregation in large dynamic networks", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS ACM USA, vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0734-2071, (20050803), pages 219 - 252, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/1090000/1082470/p219-jelasity.pdf?key1=1082470&key2=5847373411&coll=GUIDE&dl=GUIDE&CFID=68436606&CFTOKEN=69599798, (20060330), XP002375155 [A] 1-14 * page 220 - page 222 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1082469.1082470