Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1909650

EP1909650 - MEDICAL APPARATUS SYSTEM HAVING OPTICAL FIBER LOAD SENSING CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Change - applicantpublished on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical International Holding S.à r.l.
4, rue Dicks
1417 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/33]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
St. Jude Medical Luxembourg Holding S.à.r.l.
4 rue Dicks
1417 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
St. Jude Medical GVA Sàrl
Chemin du Grand-Puits 42
1217 Meyrin / CH
Former [2008/16]For all designated states
Endosense S.A.
Route de Satigny 42
1217 Meyrin / CH
Inventor(s)01 / LEO, Giovanni
17, Av des Cavaliers
CH-1224 Chene Bougeries / CH
02 / AEBY, Nicolas
rue Louis-Curval 6
CH-1206 Geneve / CH
03 / INAUDI, Daniele
Via Cassarinetta 2
CH-6900 Lugano / CH
 [2008/16]
Representative(s)Valea AB
P.O. Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Bugnion Genève
Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
Former [2008/16]Bugnion Genève
Bugnion S.A. P.O.Box 375
1211 Geneva 12 / CH
Application number, filing date06795186.301.08.2006
[2008/16]
WO2006IB02090
Priority number, dateUS2005023705328.09.2005         Original published format: US 237053
US2006043692615.05.2006         Original published format: US 436926
US20050704825P01.08.2005         Original published format: US 704825 P
[2008/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007015139
Date:08.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1909650
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1909650
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1909650
Date:17.12.2014
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/00, A61B19/00
[2008/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHES GERÄTESYSTEM MIT FASEROPTISCHER LASTMESSUNG[2008/16]
English:MEDICAL APPARATUS SYSTEM HAVING OPTICAL FIBER LOAD SENSING CAPABILITY[2008/16]
French:SYSTEME D'APPAREIL MEDICAL ASSURANT UNE FONCTION DE DETECTION DE CHARGE AU MOYEN D'UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE[2008/16]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2008National basic fee paid 
23.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
25.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2014Fee for grant paid
17.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP11158967.7  / EP2363073
EP15188373.3  / EP3028645
EP19182069.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.07.2015  13.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Nymphenburgerstrasse 4
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 [2015/43]
Former [2015/33]
Opponent(s)01  08.07.2015   
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
14.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2181/17
29.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2181/17
28.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200904   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.08.2006
AT08.10.2014
BE08.10.2014
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE01.08.2015
LU01.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2017/39]HU01.08.2006
AT08.10.2014
BG08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
TR08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE01.08.2015
LU01.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
IE01.08.2015
LU01.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU01.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
MC08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU01.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
LU01.08.2015
Former [2016/12]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SI08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
SK08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
CZ08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
RO08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
EE08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
DK08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT08.10.2014
CY08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT08.10.2014
ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
LV08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PL08.10.2014
SE08.10.2014
GR09.01.2015
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES08.10.2014
FI08.10.2014
LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
IS08.02.2015
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
PT09.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT08.10.2014
NL08.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL08.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0174252  (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11-17,19,27,31,33,38,39 * pages 27,33; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO0133165  (ADVANCED SENSOR TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1,13,14,16,27,38,39 * pages 5-7; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2001021843  (BOSSELMANN THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1,13,14,16,27,38,39 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0011]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0934728  (ECLIPSE SURGICAL TECH [US]) [Y] 1,13,14,16,27,38,39 * paragraph [0048]; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US6113593  (TU LILY CHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1,13,14,16,27,38,39 * columns 7-9; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]WO0219903  (OPTOMED AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0133165
 WO0174252
 EP0934728