26.01.2024 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
20.12.2023 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
12.11.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
24.07.2023 |
Deletion: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
16.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
04.08.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
08.04.2022 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
23.07.2021 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.07.2021 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
13.07.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
29.09.2017 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
07.12.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.06.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
01.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
25.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
04.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
08.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
04.01.2016 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
18.09.2015 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
17.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
10.07.2015 |
Opposition filed |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
22.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
20.12.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
14.11.2014 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
10.10.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
05.09.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.06.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
18.02.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2011 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
15.02.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.11.2010 |
First examination report |
|
22.11.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
05.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.03.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
14.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
27.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|