Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1925142

EP1925142 - RADIO LINK CONTROL UNACKNOWLEDGED MODE HEADER OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SISVEL International S.A.
6 Avenue Marie Thérèse
2132 Luxembourg / LU
[2015/30]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
SISVEL International S.A.
44 rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2012/34]For all designated states
Sisvel international S.A.
44, rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust
Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company
National Association
919 North Market Street, Suite 1600
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / MALKAMAKI, Esa
Riippakaivuntie 17B
FI-02130 Espoo / FI
 [2008/22]
Representative(s)Baroni, Matteo , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l.
Foro Buonaparte, 51
20121 Milano / IT
[2013/24]
Former [2008/22]Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date06795314.122.08.2006
[2008/22]
WO2006IB02292
Priority number, dateUS20050710193P23.08.2005         Original published format: US 710193 P
[2008/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007023364
Date:01.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1925142
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007
[2008/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1925142
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W28/06
[2013/16]
Former International [2008/22]H04L29/06, H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/44]
Former [2008/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERUNG DER KOPFDATEN EINES RADIO LINK CONTROL IM UNACKNOWLEDGED MODE[2015/44]
English:RADIO LINK CONTROL UNACKNOWLEDGED MODE HEADER OPTIMIZATION[2008/22]
French:OPTIMISATION D'EN-TETE EN MODE NON ACCUSE DE RECEPTION A COMMANDE DE LIAISON RADIO[2008/22]
Former [2008/22]FUNKSTRECKENSTEUERUNG-UNBESTÄTIGUNGS-MODUS-KOPFTEIL-OPTIMIERUNG
Entry into regional phase14.03.2008National basic fee paid 
14.03.2008Search fee paid 
14.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/22]
14.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2015Fee for grant paid
15.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2015
Opposition(s)29.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
01.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201510   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.08.2006
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/28]HU22.08.2006
CY28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2017/23]DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/49]DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/39]DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/36]EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/25]FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/24]FI28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT28.10.2015
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/20]LT28.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1195923  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-31 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1, 6 *;
 [A]WO02098105  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-31 * page 17, line 6 - line 26Radio Link *
International search[A]WO2005022814  ;
 [A]WO0021253  ;
 [AP]US2005213605  ;
 [E]EP1724977